Accounts and annual returns FEDERATION OF GHANAIAN MUSLIM WOMEN ASSOCIATIONS UK

Charity number: 1184149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window