Trustees BRISTOL MEDICO-CHIRURGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1181791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jonathan Pitts-Crick | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Prof David John Cahill | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Tom Frewin | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Feras Naaisa | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Monika Blackwell | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Victor Laurence Barley | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nabil Al-Jarad | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER KENNETH CARPENTER | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.