Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CARCLAZE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1178902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 November 2020 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required