Accounts and annual returns BILD - BURTON ICADEMY FOR LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1179775
Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 939 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window