Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL WITH ST AUGUSTINE, BECKENHAM

Charity number: 1179081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late Download Open in new window