Trustees ESTUARY AND MOUNTAIN MISSION AREA
Charity number: 1179900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Hooper | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Moore | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Rachel Hall | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashley Griffiths | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev GARETH DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Rule | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Joan Hearty | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Revd Hainsworth | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARRIE-ANN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Fenney-Williams | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORNA OWENS | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DOBBS | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev DOMINIC AUSTIN CAWDELL OGS | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Louise Evans | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS ALICE DAVIES-WRIGHT | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISON KAY EVANS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MASSEY | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev HUGH NIGEL BURGESS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
GABRIELA HUSBAND | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||
JACKIE BLAIN | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN HALL | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNN FEARNHEAD | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN EVANS | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN AUSTERBERRY | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID BURTON | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE HEWITT | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LEGG BA BSC FRH | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WHELDON CAUDWELL | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.