THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP AUCKLAND

Charity number: 1180703
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev MATTHEW PAUL KEDDILTY Chair 06 November 2017 None on record
CATHERINE ELIZABETH TAYLOR Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
EILEEN KHEAN GEOK HARROP Trustee 10 June 2016 None on record
James Masters Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
ANTHONY JOHN COULLS Trustee 14 May 2019
THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM Charity reporting is up to date
MARTIN JAMES WOOD Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
Nicholas David White Trustee 28 April 2019
ELEVEN ARCHES Charity reporting is up to date
Patricia Marie White Trustee 14 May 2019 None on record
JOHN RODERICK NEAL WAINE Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
MARILYN ANNE WEERASINGHE Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record