CITY OF SANCTUARY UK

Charity number: 1184613
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Mark Henry Ellis Trustee 26 July 2019 None on record
HERBERT DIRAHU Trustee 26 July 2019 None on record
Dr Jeffery Richard MORGAN Trustee 26 July 2019 None on record
Joseph Chivayo Trustee 26 July 2019 None on record
Ben Margolis Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record
Dr Pamela Mary INDER Trustee 26 July 2019 None on record
Adrian Bulley Trustee 26 May 2020 None on record
ANDREW DOUGLAS WHITE Trustee 26 July 2019
SOUTHAMPTON AND WINCHESTER VISITORS GROUP Charity reporting is up to date
Amani Hassan Abbaker Yahya Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record
Richard Meredith Williams Trustee 03 February 2020
THE HUMMINGBIRD REFUGEE PROJECT Charity reporting is up to date