Accounts and annual returns REDBRIDGE MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1180015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window