THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN LYMM

Charity number: 1179339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Jonathan Martin Wide Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Mark Charles Dyson Bainton Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
JILL HODGSON WASEY Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Kathryn Joan Buckley Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Lewis Arthur Denton Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
DAVID BRIAN YOUNG Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Elizabeth Irene France Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
CAROLE JOAN RILEY Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Rev Jillian Frances Elston Trustee 04 July 2021 None on record
TIMOTHY RICHARD MORRIS Trustee 09 May 2021 None on record
Lesley Claire Whitefield Trustee 09 May 2021 None on record
DEREK BUCKTHORPE Trustee 08 April 1987
MOTHERS' UNION (CHESTER DIOCESE)
Rev Beverley Jameson Chair 06 November 2017
LYMM GRAMMAR SCHOOL Received: On time
CLOTHING CHARITY Received: On time
Peter Clark Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Simon John Fathers Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
IAN OLIVER BUNDEY Trustee 31 March 1982
ROTARY CLUB OF LYMM TRUST FUND Received: On time
Michael Ernest Hall Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record
Robert Patrick Buckley Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
Joan Garrett Trustee 13 September 2020 None on record