IBAD-UR-RAHMAN TRUST

Charity number: 512616
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £545.53k £1.28m £929.40k £668.76k £683.40k
Total expenditure £304.92k £264.54k £297.16k £359.26k £437.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £525.35k £1.26m £917.69k £666.61k £677.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20.18k £16.02k £11.71k £2.15k £5.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £304.92k £264.54k £297.16k £359.26k £437.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.82k £5.34k £7.26k £6.59k £5.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0