Trustees VASCULITIS UK
Charity number: 1180473
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS D. IRELAND | Chair | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Dawn Wright | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Tolliday | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Jeanette Shonfield | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Edwards | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Joanne Pollard | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Alice Smith | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Angharad Harper | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Helier Sherbourne Harper | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Anthony Rutherford | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MILLS | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.