Trustees ABER-MORFA MISSION AREA
Charity number: 1180993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jayne Coxall | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Robbins | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Robbins | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dezna Hall | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Littler | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hughes | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Enid Littler | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Woodward | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Holmes | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Griffith | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janet Denise Crane | Trustee | 12 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Stuart Spencer | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARA DAVIDSON | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAIR ELUNED JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BUNDY | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
NORA ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FLORENCE CARTHY | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET VERA DONOHUE | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWINA LINDSAY OWEN | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WILSON | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Dollery | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Mill | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANN SIMPSON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALAN SIMPSON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.