Trustees CARMARTHENSHIRE THERAPY DOGS
Charity number: 1181987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN SMITH | Chair | 23 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Horton | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Cornfield | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Petra Alexandra Kennedy | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Ann Cowley | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Lewis | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sides | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.