Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, FLAMSTEAD

Charity number: 1179567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Joanna Mary Heal Trustee 03 October 2021
THE FRIENDS OF ST LEONARD'S FLAMSTEAD
Received: On time
Clare Rudd Trustee 21 October 2020
THE FRIENDS OF ST LEONARD'S FLAMSTEAD
Received: On time
The Blue Tangerine Charity
Received: On time
Laura Parr Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Karen Maxine Barton Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
JOHN ERNEST KING Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
MARY JENKIN Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
MIRANDA JANE MOTLEY Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
GREG PARSONS Trustee 15 April 2018
THE FRIENDS OF ST LEONARD'S FLAMSTEAD
Received: On time