Trustees ST JAMES'S CHURCH, RYDE
Charity number: 1181957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMES Henry Aufrere LEGGETT DIPHE | Chair | 31 August 1997 |
|
|
||||
Nathan John Hassett | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD PAUL WILLIAM BELL MBE | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Wright | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Adam Ostler | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Leslie Smith | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Patricia Anne Cotton | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Suzanne Hunt | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Sidney Colman | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Wyatt | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.