Financial history THE NEWARK AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 512862
Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £169 £131 £80 £75 £75
Total expenditure £1.54k £1.54k £1.09k £2.83k £1.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A