Accounts and annual returns THE NEW ARC MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1181112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 June 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 June 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 June 2020 02 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 17 June 2020 02 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 June 2019 02 August 2020 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 June 2019 02 August 2020 107 days late Download Open in new window