Accounts and annual returns OKEHAMPTON STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1181119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window