Trustees MARK MILSOME FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1180011
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Wainstein | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Gabrielle Allen | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Lewis Defis | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Virginia Tannahill | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suntosh Kumary Bains | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edwin Sindall | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Joseph Gerard Hickey | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDRA SUZANNE MILSOME | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.