Trustees FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME

Charity number: 1185531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Jones Chair 17 May 2018
None on record
Julie Cooper Trustee 20 January 2023
HOME-START NEWCASTLE BOROUGH
Received: On time
Michael John Hill Trustee 12 November 2022
None on record
Marie-Claire Marcelle Billard Trustee 12 November 2022
None on record
Wendy Ann Brockie Trustee 12 November 2022
None on record
Sandra Glenys Key Trustee 12 November 2022
None on record
Anne Becket Trustee 13 November 2021
None on record
Jeremy Lefroy Trustee 13 November 2021
STAFFORD WORKS
Received: On time
IVCC
Received: On time
Global Coalition for Youth Employment
Received: On time
THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR STAFFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION
Overdue by 27 days
CAFE AFRICA TRUST
Received: On time
THE YARLET TRUST
Received: On time
THE DONALD MACKAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE MYCRO TRUST
Overdue by 22 days
THE BUCKE COLLINS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
TANZANIA DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION
Received: 3 days late
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT CARERS HOLIDAY TRUST
Received: On time
CONCORDIS INTERNATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
STAFFORDSHIRE HISTORY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Overdue by 27 days
Alec Wright Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
David Cedric Noble Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Keith Greatbatch Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
Ruth Wright Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record