Trustees KIRKWOOD HOSPICE
Charity number: 512987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORRAINE ANNETTE CHAPMAN | Chair | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Penny McSorley | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Johnson | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Burchell | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Green | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Robert Wilson Dr | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ward Roberts Prof | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Leslie Scovell | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Davies | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christina Maria Quinn | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Black | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Ronald Sands | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.