DANCE UNITED YORKSHIRE CIO

Charity number: 1181600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann-Marie Teed Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
Stephanie Derrick Trustee 29 October 2019 None on record
Robert Blair Davies Chair 17 January 2019 None on record
Nikki Crane Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Julia Helen White Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Keira Mari Martin Trustee 17 January 2019 None on record