Trustees Backworth Hall Scouts
Charity number: 1181929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Drew Wiggett | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Lowes | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Robert Bailey | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam George Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Joanne Hurst | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Ellis | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Roff | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Darren Bailey | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amy Thompson | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.