Trustees MONTGOMERY YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 1180654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
48 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARA SMITH | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARYS ROBERTS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LOWRI DAVIES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MABLI JOHNSON | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GRUG EVANS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL DAVIES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Owen | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRYSTAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LUCY JONES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNI BROWN | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aled Rees | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA LEWIS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA OWEN | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FFLOYD LEWIS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DYFAN PARRY JONES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIN HAF WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DYFAN BREEZE | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELOISA ISAAC | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE GETHIN | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUBY GRIGG | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES ANDREW | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
GWENNAN JONES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE WHITTICASE | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURA ANDREW | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIN EVANS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MEINIR WIGLEY | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATIE JONES | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARETH ROBINSON | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN WIGLEY | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMY WAINWRIGHT | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
TESNI PRYS JONES | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ERIN CLARK | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
HYWEL JONES | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALUN TUDOR THOMAS | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
EMILY WOODALL | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
JESS ANDREWS | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMMA HARDING | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
HARRY GARDNER | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elin Lewis | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Sioned Mills | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANWEN ORRELLS | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Owen | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA BANKS | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynfa Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jerman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALUN JONES | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DART | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MORGAN | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.