Trustees THE FOLKESTONE - HYTHE OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1180504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Milton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Hawkins | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Merewyn Rosa Forrest | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myra Gillian Collingridge | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Victoria Holness | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Lewis | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Chisnall | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DENNEL MANTON | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.