Accounts and annual returns SANDWELL TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 513180
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 24 May 2019 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 02 October 2017 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 02 October 2017 | 124 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 10 October 2016 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 10 October 2016 | 132 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window