Trustees UK CENTRE FOR ECOLOGY & HYDROLOGY

Charity number: 1185618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ewen James Cameron of Dillington Chair 17 April 2018
None on record
Professor Sir Hugh Charles Jonathan Godfray Trustee 19 August 2021
None on record
Lynette Claire Eastman Trustee 11 January 2021
None on record
Alexia Wai-Chun Tye Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Mark Jonathan Bailey Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
William James Hyde Galgey Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Linda Anne Naylor Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Alexander Benet Paul Hornby Northcote Trustee 10 July 2018
THE GREEN ALLIANCE TRUST
Received: On time
Neil Grant Scragg Trustee 10 July 2018
BEECHWOOD PARK SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Iain Miles Macgregor Gillespie Trustee 17 April 2018
None on record