Accounts and annual returns GARSINGTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1180768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required