Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES SILSDEN
Charity number: 1180781

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Griffiths | Chair | 10 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Connor Anderson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Frank Hudson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ruth Goddard | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Thorley | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Geoffrey Goddard | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Newsome | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NEIL CHARLES WHITAKER | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Marie Robinson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Kurt Smithson | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Mark Anderson | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Towers | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Angela Griffiths | Trustee | 10 September 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.