Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEMERTON, SALISBURY
Charity number: 1183774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kevin Martin | Chair | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Koral Emileen Hull | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bird | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Burley | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Birthe Mester | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wells | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neal Carl Dreyer | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patience Anne Dreyer | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Frayling | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Kershaw | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Kershaw | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin John Frayling | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Anne Bird | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.