Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT WITH ST MATTHIAS EARL'S COURT
Charity number: 1182543

Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Andrew Bagott | Chair | 20 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Jill Patricia Llewellyn | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Brian Edward Parsons | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Estella Gomez | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Bill Troop | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Anthony Hills | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Paul David Scutt | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Nicholas Jackson Brett Green | Trustee | 25 April 1994 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.