THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HILDA, WARLEY WOODS

Charity number: 1181258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNE HARRIS Trustee 07 April 2019
CARRS LANE COUNSELLING CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
DR TERRY DANIELS BSC PHD Trustee 10 April 2016 None on record
WENDY VERONICA DYKE Trustee 01 April 2007 None on record
PETER JOHN STOKES Trustee 29 April 2001 None on record
John Matthew Barber Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
Patricia Elizabeth Allen Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Rev Jennifer Ruth Crewes Chair 07 July 2020
SMETHWICK CHURCH ACTION NETWORK Received: On time
PATRICIA ANN CROFTS Trustee 10 April 2016 None on record
RICHARD CRAIG HAYNES Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH JOAN FARRIER Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
SUSAN JANE ROUND Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record