Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST OSWALD'S, GRASMERE

Charity number: 1181346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 October 2022 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 April 2022 158 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late Download Open in new window