Accounts and annual returns URBOND

Charity number: 1184273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 05 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 16 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window