Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL ARCHIVES CIO
Charity number: 1185971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Sara Gunaratne | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carles Waddicor | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harald Gunter Wollinger | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Toby Campbell Ewin | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Gould | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Gregory | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Bibko | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Martin Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lee Deighton | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.