Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, COVENTRY
Charity number: 1182334
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Atkinson PhD | Chair | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Laura Sherry | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cholawo | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Mills | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eben-Ezer Chinyati | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel King | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Schoolar | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scott | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathanael Hodges | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hall | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andy Bavester | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lowe | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Jones | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Patricia Wickens | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Phipps | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.