THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRIARMERE, ST THOMAS

Charity number: 1183135
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Woods Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
William Crawford Maxwell Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Jonathan Wright Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Rev Hilary Ann Edgerton Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
RICHARD JAMES CHARLES LAIT Trustee 05 March 2017 None on record
Rev Richard John Lambert Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Rev JOHN RICHARD ROSEDALE Trustee 24 April 2016
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREENFIELD, ST MARY Received: On time
Susan Powell Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
REV PATRICIA JULIE GILLIAN Trustee 08 April 2018
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LYDGATE, ST ANNE Received: On time
Rev BARBARA CHRISTOPHER Trustee 08 April 2018
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREENFIELD, ST MARY Received: On time
Rev SHARON JONES Chair 05 March 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD, SADDLEWORTH Received: On time
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF CHRIST CHURCH FRIEZLAND Received: On time
Jennifer Weir Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Rev Michael Charles Donmall Trustee 08 April 2018
WELLSPRINGS EL TULAR Received: On time
Rev Aaron Anthony Jackman Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
Janet Powell Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
Gillian Margaret Clark Trustee 05 March 2017 None on record
Darren David Quinlan Trustee 05 March 2017 None on record
Anne Mary Sankaran M.B.E. Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
GEOFFREY DENT Trustee 05 March 2017
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
INFRARED AND RAMAN DISCUSSION GROUP (IRDG) Received: 8 days late
Alyson Jane Lambert Trustee 05 March 2017 None on record
Julie Ann Lait Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Rev Philip Howard Williamson Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
Fiona Elizabeth Thompson Trustee 05 March 2017 None on record
Valerie Joyce Cronin Trustee 13 October 2020 None on record