Trustees QUORN MILLS PARK BOWLING CLUB
Charity number: 1182715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ian Walters | Chair | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Aspinall | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ROTHERA | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Eggleston | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malvyn Mugglestone | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew George Thomson | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
John Ventham | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ann Bustin | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David George Radley | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hogg | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lindsey | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Helen Radley | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.