Accounts and annual returns PAKISTAN'S CHILDREN

Charity number: 1182180
Charity reporting is overdue by 411 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 411 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 411 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 May 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 May 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window