Trustees 17-24-30 NATIONAL HATE CRIME AWARENESS WEEK

Charity number: 1184819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Justin Healey Chair 08 January 2019
None on record
Michael Avila Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Pek-San Tan Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Dr Danni Glover Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Deborah Elaine Charles Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Menara Ahmed Trustee 13 April 2022
None on record
Sharon Marcia Kilborne Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Nicholas Guy McInerny Trustee 06 January 2022
None on record
Jordan Issac Flaste Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record