THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S. PAUL, DEPTFORD

Charity number: 1182791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lavern Marie-Anne Ford Trustee 25 March 2001 None on record
William John Dawes Mr Trustee 30 May 2021 None on record
Olive May Nelson Trustee 18 March 2012 None on record
Christopher Alan Humphries Trustee 15 March 2015 None on record
THE REVEREND FATHER PAUL DAVID BUTLER B.A. HONS Chair 15 October 2006
THE DEPTFORD ST PAUL CHARITY Received: On time
Andrew Taylor Trustee 18 March 2012 None on record
Cynthia Addokwei Trustee 14 March 2010 None on record
Estelle Madeleine Makaya Nzouzi Trustee 09 March 2014 None on record
Vidal Veronica Eghan Trustee 22 March 1998 None on record
Nicholas Edward David Richards Trustee 15 March 2015 None on record