Accounts and annual returns LEDBURY YOUTH ACTIVITIES SUPPORT

Charity number: 1182886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window