Trustees THE FRIENDS OF SUTTONS PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1182487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allison Roberts | Chair | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ka Yan Lau | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jones | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jack | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Kew | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hunter-Brown | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Baker | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lacey Michelle Lighterness | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angie Brown | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.