Trustees THE BOW TRUST (DURHAM) LIMITED

Charity number: 513865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Adrian Gareth Green Chair
VERNACULAR ARCHITECTURE GROUP
Received: On time
THE CITY OF DURHAM TRUST
Overdue by 68 days
DURHAM VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Overdue by 137 days
Dorothy Cummings Trustee 04 May 2021
None on record
Rev Canon Michael John Everitt Trustee 01 October 2019
THE PERU MISSION
Received: On time
Dr Andrew Roy Millard Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Kevin Teed Cummings Trustee 03 May 2018
None on record
Dr JOHN BROWN Trustee 29 October 2012
None on record
DAVID ROBERT FREEMAN Trustee
None on record
DENNIS HANKEY JONES Trustee
None on record
JOSEPHINE MARY JONES Trustee
None on record