Trustees RUTLAND AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1186008
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger David Wood Chair 21 July 2014
FOUNDATION FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION
Received: On time
MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rupert Charles Mayo Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Sally Ann Brook Shanahan Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Mark Kenneth Aitchison Trustee 05 November 2019
None on record
Robert Harvey Miles Trustee 01 April 2019
SUSTAINABLE LAND TRUST
Received: On time
Alastair Roland Leake Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
JONATHAN RALPH BAKER Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record