Trustees DA'WATUL ISLAM UK AND EIRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1186155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD ABU SAYEED | Chair | 02 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Farid Ahmed Reza | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Khalilur Rahman | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shabbir Ahmad Kawsar | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Abul Hasanat Mohammed Shahid Chowdhury | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdur Rahman | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arman Ali | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mafruha Khatoon | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Abdul Mukit | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Muhammad Rafiqul Islam | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Forida Haque | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Kamal Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Ahmed Abdul Malik | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD MARFATH ALI | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|||||
HASAN MUHAMMAD MUEENUDDIN | Trustee | 02 July 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.