Trustees THE BENTLEY OPERATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 513983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Craig | Chair | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Baillie | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pritesh Nathubhai | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELLIOT TUTT | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Galley | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE O'KEEFFE | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Galley | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neil Allcock | Trustee | 21 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAM COTTRELL | Trustee | 17 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.