Trustees WORTHING THEATRES & MUSEUM
Charity number: 1185189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Mark Cadwallader | Chair | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oluwayemisi Mokuolu | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREAS SPARSIS | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Lydia Cassidy | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Persson Swain | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Scott Bradley Marshall | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Cepta Kelly | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Burgess | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Kenneth Parsonage | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stuart Comben | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.