Accounts and annual returns IVER YOUTH AND COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity number: 1183462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 July 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window